Senate | 05/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 940.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1408.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 296.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |