Senate | 06/26/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2111.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 575.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |