Senate | 08/29/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2710.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 13). | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 521.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |