Senate | 09/06/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 2845.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 522.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |