LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR10
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR10
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR10
Action History
Senate
04/08/2013
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 433.)
Senate
04/02/2013
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 389.) (April 2).
Senate
03/21/2013
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
03/20/2013
Set for hearing April 2.
Senate
01/17/2013
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
01/14/2013
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.