LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR16
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR16
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR16
Action History
Senate
09/06/2013
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2173.)
Senate
08/30/2013
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
08/29/2013
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Senate
08/22/2013
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
08/12/2013
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.