LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR18
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR18
Action History
Senate
09/10/2013
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2301.)
Senate
08/28/2013
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
08/27/2013
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2008.) (August 26).
Senate
08/22/2013
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing August 26.
Senate
08/12/2013
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.