California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR19 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/06/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SR 19ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 6, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 19, 1950 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee AUGUST 28, 2013 Relative to California Radiologic Technology Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, Radiologic technologists play an integral part of the healthcare system by operating the diagnostic x-ray equipment that produces x-ray images and assisting radiologists and other physicians to achieve efficacious diagnosis; and WHEREAS, Diagnostic medical imaging and radiation therapy performed by radiologic technologists save lives, yet few people are aware of what these professionals do; and WHEREAS, The diagnostic medical imaging community is like minded in caring deeply for those who require medical attention; and WHEREAS, There are 300,000 imaging technologists nationwide and 20,000 imaging technologists in California who are dedicated to being patient advocates; and WHEREAS, The California Society of Radiologic Technologists (CSRT), established in 1938 as the California Society of X-Ray Technicians, is a professional organization that represents radiologic technologists in the State of California; and WHEREAS, Throughout the country, organizations such as CSRT will recognize those individuals who use diagnostic and therapeutic radiologic technology on a daily basis to care for patients by celebrating National Radiologic Technology Week from November 3, to November 9, 2013; and WHEREAS, CSRT will be hosting radiologic technologists and imaging specialists from across the State of California at the CSRT Annual Conference, entitled "Medical Imaging: From Acquisition to Innovation," on November 9, 2013; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby recognizes the week of November 3, to November 9, 2013, as California Radiologic Technology Week and acknowledges the California Society of Radiologic Technologists commitment to patient care and radiologic safety; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.