LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR40
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR40
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR40
Action History
Senate
05/08/2014
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 3. Page 3415.)
Senate
05/07/2014
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3403.) (May 6).
Senate
04/25/2014
Set for hearing May 6.
Senate
04/22/2014
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
04/10/2014
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.