LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR41
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR41
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR41
Action History
Senate
06/11/2014
Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3838.) Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3839.)
Senate
06/05/2014
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Senate
05/28/2014
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
05/22/2014
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
05/07/2014
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.