LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR49
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR49
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR49
Action History
Senate
06/23/2014
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 3. Page 4051.)
Senate
06/19/2014
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
06/18/2014
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Senate
06/11/2014
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
06/03/2014
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.