Senate | 08/20/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4659.) | ||
Senate | 08/18/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2014 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4444.) (August 12). | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Set for hearing August 12. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |