LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR8
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR8
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR8
Action History
Senate
02/11/2013
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 132.)
Senate
02/04/2013
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
01/31/2013
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Senate
01/16/2013
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
01/09/2013
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.