BILL NUMBER: SR 9ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JANUARY 28, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 19, 1950 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff JANUARY 11, 2013 Relative to School Choice Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, The California Constitution requires the Legislature to encourage by all suitable means the promotion of intellectual, scientific, moral, and agricultural improvement; and WHEREAS, Excellence in education is a primary goal of the State of California; and WHEREAS, California's student body is one of the most diverse in the world and therefore requires diverse educational opportunities; and WHEREAS, A child's residence should not determine the quality of his or her education; and WHEREAS, All students in California, regardless of background, should have access to the highest quality schools possible; and WHEREAS, Taxpayers and parents who fund the public school system should be able to choose which school is best for their children within state and local legal parameters; and WHEREAS, School choice promotes parental involvement; and WHEREAS, School choice spans all socioeconomic, political, cultural, and ethnic groups; and WHEREAS, California recognizes the many high-quality teachers and school employees in public and nonpublic schools who are committed to educating children; and WHEREAS, Parents, students, and teachers in states across the nation come together each year to recognize school choice and the need for effective educational options for all children; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims the week of January 27, 2013, through February 2, 2013, as "School Choice Week"; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.