LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1001
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1001
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1001
Compare Versions
AB1001 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB1001 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1001 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1001 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1001 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1001 Amended January 14, 2016
AB1001 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1001 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1001 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB1001 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1001 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1001 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1001 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1001 Amended January 14, 2016
AB1001 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1001 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare