|
08/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1879.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1478.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1434.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|