|
07/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1491.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1263.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|