|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 33. Page 2839.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2333.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 1587.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1486.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|