Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 845.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 8. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2015 | Read first time. To print. |