|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2872.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2398.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1438.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|