|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 308, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2298.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1817.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|