Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2015 | Read first time. From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2015 | Introduced. To print. |