|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 595, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2666.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2120.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1595.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|