Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1389.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |