Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | Read first time. To print. |