|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3064.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2640.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1626.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|