LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1064
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1064
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1064
Compare Versions
AB1064 Chaptered September 28, 2015
AB1064 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB1064 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1064 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1064 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1064 Chaptered September 28, 2015
AB1064 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB1064 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1064 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1064 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare