California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1072 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2015

Amended

Bill August 19, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill June 10, 2015
Bill April 28, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015