California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1074 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/15/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1074AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cristina Garcia FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Sections 25010, 25142, and 25991 to the Public Resources Code, relating to alternative transportation fuels. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1074, as amended, Cristina Garcia. Alternative fuels: infrastructure. The Warren-Alquist State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Act establishes the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission and requires the commission to prepare a biennial integrated energy policy report containing an overview of major energy trends and issues facing the state, including supply, demand, pricing, reliability, efficiency, and impacts on public health and safety, the economy, resources, and the environment. The commission is required to make recommendations to improve the efficiency of transportation energy use, reduce dependence on petroleum fuels, decrease environmental impacts from transportation energy use, and contribute to reducing congestion, promoting economic development, and enhancing energy diversity and security. Existing law authorizes the Humboldt Bay Harbor, Recreation, and Conservation District and specified harbor and port districts, as defined, to jointly, with an electrical corporation, gas corporation, community choice aggregator established on or before July 1, 2013, or publicly owned electric or gas utility serving the district, to prepare one or more energy management plans to reduce air emissions and promote economic development through the addition of new businesses and the retention of existing businesses in the district. Existing law requires that if a district prepares an energy management plan pursuant to these provisions, that the plan include specified provisions. This bill would add a definition of "alternative fuel" and would provide that it is the policy of the state to help accelerate the adoption of vehicles using alternative fuels throughout the state by increasing the amount of charging and refueling options needed to facilitate electric, hydrogen, and natural gas vehicles traveling along all passenger and goods movement corridors on federal and state highways. The bill  would,   would  require the commission to conduct an assessment and develop an  intergrated   integrated  strategy to maximize the benefits and scope of an alternative refueling infrastructure, as defined, to help the state achieve its climate change, air quality, and economic goals and this newly stated policy.  The bill would require the commission, as part of this assessment and strategy, to develop a refueling infrastructure plan that identifies specified matter and to   provide the infrastructure plan to the Legislature on or before January 1, 2017.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25010 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 25010. It is the policy of the state and the intent of the Legislature to help accelerate the adoption of vehicles using alternative fuels throughout the state by increasing the amount of charging and refueling options needed to facilitate electric, hydrogen, and natural gas vehicles traveling along all passenger and goods movement corridors on federal and state highways. SEC. 2. Section 25142 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 25142. "Alternative fuel" include biodiesel, bioalcohol (methanol, ethanol, and butanol),  chemically stored electricity (batteries and fuel cells),   electricity,  hydrogen, compressed fossil or nonfossil natural gas, liquefied fossil or nonfossil natural gas, vegetable oil, propane, and other biomass sources. SEC. 3. Section 25991 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 25991. (a) As used in this section, "alternative refueling infrastructure" means the equipment used to charge or store and dispense alternative fuel to vehicles according to industry codes and standards that is open to the public. (b) The commission shall conduct an assessment and develop an  intergrated   integrated  strategy to maximize the benefits and scope of an alternative refueling infrastructure to help the state achieve its climate change, air quality, and economic goals and the policy described in Section 25010. As part of this assessment and strategy, the commission shall develop a refueling infrastructure plan that identifies both of the following: (1) The number and types of stations that are needed to fulfill the policy goal described in Section 25010. (2) The geographical areas where additional stations will be needed.  (c) Where applicable, when conducting the assessment, developing the integrated strategy, and developing the refueling infrastructure plan, the commission shall rely upon, and consolidate, existing reports and information.   (d) The commission shall provide the infrastructure plan to the Legislature on or before January 1, 2017.