|
08/12/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1790.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1487.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1089.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|