Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |