Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |