California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1101 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 11, 2015

Amended

Bill July 1, 2015
Bill June 17, 2015
Bill May 20, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015