|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 377, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2742.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2298.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1330.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1256.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|