California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015