California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2016

Amended

Bill May 11, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015