Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1487.) | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |