Senate | 06/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 15). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1429.). | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 642.) | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2015 | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2015 | Introduced. To print. |