California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 14, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015