|
10/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 482, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2872.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2408.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1543.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|