Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2635.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1725.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|