California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1164 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/21/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1164AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gatto FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to add Section 14526.7 to the Government Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1164, as amended, Gatto. State highways:  performance measures.   evaluation   and rating.  Existing law gives the Department of Transportation full possession and control of the state highways. Existing law requires the department to prepare a state highway operation and protection program for the expenditure of transportation funds for major capital improvements that are necessary to preserve and protect the state highway system. This bill would require the  department to develop performance measures,   department,  in consultation with specified entities, to  establish   conduct  an  annual  evaluation and rating of the overall quality of the state highway  system,   system and   the resources needed to provide a system in good repair,  and would require a report to specified committees of the Legislature in that regard annually until 2020. The bill would also require the department to post the report on its Internet Web site. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14526.7 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14526.7. (a) The department shall  develop performance measures to establish     conduct  an  annual  evaluation and rating of the overall quality of the state highway  system.   system and the resources needed   to   provide a system in good repair.  The  measures   evaluation  shall demonstrate how resource, staffing, and programming decisions impact the overall condition of the state highway system. The  measures   evaluation  shall address the number of distressed lane miles, bridge conditions, and life cycle costs.  The evaluation shall also include, but not be limited to, all of the following:   (1) The rating of the state's urban interstate lane miles, measured according to the International Roughness Index, and the schedule and resources needed to bring at least 90 percent of the lane miles rated less than 170 (the federal rating of poor condition) into good condition.   (2) The rating of the state's rural interstate lane miles, measured according to the International Roughness Index, and the schedule and resources needed to bring at least 95 percent of the lane miles rated less than 170 (the federal rating of poor condition) into good condition.   (3) The percentage of lane miles on the state freeways and highways that are distressed lane miles and the schedule and resources needed to bring the percentage of distressed lane miles to 5 percent or less.   (4) The schedule and resources needed to bring the pavement level of service to the well-maintained pavement level for 95 percent or more of the lane miles on the state freeways and highways.   (5) The percentage of the state's bridges that achieve a bridge health index (BHI) rating of at least 94, the percentage of bridges with a BHI rating of 80 or lower, and the schedule and resources needed to perform bridge maintenance and capital repairs to ensure that all of the state's bridges achieve a BHI rating of at least 94.   (6) The number of the state's bridges that are structurally deficient or functionally obsolete under federal standards and the schedule and resources needed to ensure that no more than 10 percent of the state's bridges are structurally deficient or functionally obsolete.  (b) In  developing the performance measures   conducting the evaluation  specified in subdivision (a), the department shall consult with the following: (1) The commission. (2) Regional transportation agencies. (3) County transportation agencies.  (4) The Institute of Transportation Studies at the University of California.   (5) Departments of transportation from other states.  (c) The department shall  report annually,   provide the evaluation and rating specified in subdivision (a) in an annual report,  on or before March 31,  on its activities and findings under this section  to the Assembly Committee on Transportation and the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing. The report shall also be posted on the department's Internet Web site. (d) The requirement for submitting a report imposed under subdivision (c) is inoperative after March 31, 2020, pursuant to Section 10231.5.