California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015