California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill June 19, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015