Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 1623.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|