|
09/22/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6420.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6006.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5106.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3509.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|