|
08/12/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1876.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1387.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|