Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4632.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4632.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 5562.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 3901.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|