|
04/20/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 10, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4353.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3433.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3222.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 643.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2015
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2015
|
Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|