Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1226.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|